This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 18:31:16 (UTC).

Mendones VS Board of Registered Nursing

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Mendones filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Board of Registered Nursing. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4092

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maridol C Mendones

Respondent

BOARD OF REGISTERED NURSING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Gregory Tuss

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous Remittitur

05/16/2022: Miscellaneous Remittitur

Miscellaneous Opinion from DCA

02/15/2022: Miscellaneous Opinion from DCA

Declaration of Service by Mail

05/17/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

04/22/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

03/18/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application|

03/03/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application|

Declaration Application|Ex Parte Petition for OSC

03/03/2021: Declaration Application|Ex Parte Petition for OSC

Declaration in Support Application|

03/03/2021: Declaration in Support Application|

Proposed Order Application|

03/03/2021: Proposed Order Application|

Declaration of Service by Mail

01/22/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

08/13/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

06/05/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

04/01/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

03/18/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

02/03/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

01/15/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Proposed Order Application|

12/06/2019: Proposed Order Application|

Proposed Order Application|

12/04/2019: Proposed Order Application|

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Miscellaneous Remittitur Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Miscellaneous Opinion from DCA Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of of Receipt of Appeal Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Receipt for Record on Appeal of Maridol C Mendones Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Clerk's Certificate Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Certification of Record Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Letter regarding FW from DCA Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notes: Administrative Record sent to Appeals Div.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Creditor Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Stay Filed for Maridol C Mendones - Revocation of Professional License; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maridol C Mendones; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Stay Filed for Maridol C Mendones - Revocation of Professional License; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Maridol C Mendones Granted; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 17; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Maridol C Mendones; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maridol C Mendones; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMessage: Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Registered Nursing is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M. Tuss