Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 00:42:12 (UTC).

Melin VS Farmers Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Melin filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Farmers Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1677

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STARK, SCOTT

CROWLEY, KEVIN

TALBOT, TED

MESQUIT, DEBORAH

MORTENSEN, THOMAS

LOVE, ROBERT

ORTIZ, DANNY

BECKHEYER, SHERI

GRAU, MARINA

NEAL, LINDA

RICHARDSON, LAWRENCE

Defendants

VERMETTE, LISA

DIAZ, GUADALUPE

FLORES, FRANKIE

FARMERS GROUP, INC.

GORDON, BRUCE

ELLIS, JEFFEREY

PINHEIRO, DAVID

GAMBLE, DAVID

CAYABYAB, CHRISTOPHER

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GWILLIAMS ESQ, J. GARY

DAVIS, CALVIN E.

MAILE, CHRISTOPHER S.

HUERTA, NINA

MCCLENDON, REGINA J.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/10/2020 09:15 AM D- 23

2/14/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/10/2020 09:15 AM D- 23

Tentative Case Management Order

4/7/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

11/5/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted

11/6/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/12/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/24/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Order to Correct Caption

9/9/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Order to Correct Caption

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

9/12/2019: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

Tentative Case Management Order

9/19/2019: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/30/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

7/30/2019: Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

Motion for Joinder Filed for Defendant

4/19/2019: Motion for Joinder Filed for Defendant

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Farmers Group, Inc., F

4/23/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Farmers Group, Inc., F

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Farmers Group, Inc., F

2/11/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Farmers Group, Inc., F

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jefferey Ellis Filed

2/21/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jefferey Ellis Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Fire Insurance Exchange Filed

2/21/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Fire Insurance Exchange Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Frankie Flores Filed

2/21/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Frankie Flores Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Naji Garabet Filed

2/21/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Naji Garabet Filed

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/08/2020 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of RE Continuance of Further CMC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/10/2020 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Case Management Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttendance Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Christopher Cayabyab Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Farmers Group, Inc., F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 05/07/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 04/02/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 04/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 03/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Melin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS GROUP INC DBA FARMERS UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAILE CHRISTOPHER S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUERTA NINA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GWILLIAM, J GARY