Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 02:12:13 (UTC).

Mejia VS C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Mejia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C Food Concepts Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3598

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA, VILMA NOEMI SANTAMARIA

Defendants

MARITIME MANAGEMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

C FOOD CONCEPTS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ESTRADA, ESTHER

SCRIBNER, KRISTINE M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation, Maritime Management Co

1/4/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation, Maritime Management Co

Motion for Sanctions Denied

12/17/2020: Motion for Sanctions Denied

Declaration of Maurice S. Newman, Esq. Filed

11/18/2020: Declaration of Maurice S. Newman, Esq. Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Sanctions Filed

12/4/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Sanctions Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

12/16/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation, Maritime Ma

5/11/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation, Maritime Ma

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Vilma Noemi Santamaria Mejia Filed

8/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Vilma Noemi Santamaria Mejia Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/21/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

2/24/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

4/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Initial Case Management Conference 04/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

11/20/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/18/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vilma Noemi Santamaria Mejia

11/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vilma Noemi Santamaria Mejia

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

11/18/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation, Maritime Management Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Sanctions; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Sanctions Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Maurice S. Newman, Esq. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to C Food Concepts Inc., a California Corporation, Marit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Vilma Noemi Santamaria Mejia Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Summons Issued Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vilma Noemi Santamaria Mejia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESTRADA ESTHER