This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 04:17:00 (UTC).

Mehan VS United States Commodity Funds LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Mehan filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against United States Commodity Funds LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0732

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEHAN, DARSHAN

Defendants

NGIM, ANDREW F

LOVE, JOHN P

GERBER, NICHOLAS D

ROBINSON, PETER M

ELLIS, GORDON L

CRUMBAUGH, STUART P

FOBES, MALCOLM R

NGUYEN, ROBERT L.

UNITED STATES COMMODITY FUNDS LLC

UNITED STATES OIL FUND, :P, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBBINS, BRIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

11/16/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

8/24/2020: Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/15/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/15/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

1/15/2021: Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

Compliance Hearing 01/25/2022 10:00 AM D- 21

1/21/2021: Compliance Hearing 01/25/2022 10:00 AM D- 21

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

10/5/2020: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Notice of Appearance of Anne Johnson Plamer as Councel for Defendents Filed

10/5/2020: Notice of Appearance of Anne Johnson Plamer as Councel for Defendents Filed

Proof of Service Filed

10/5/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/7/2020: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Granted

10/7/2020: Motion Granted

Application Re: Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Of Jessica M. Bergin To Appear As Counsel

10/7/2020: Application Re: Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Of Jessica M. Bergin To Appear As Counsel

Notice of Notice of Application of R. Skinner, A. Roy, and J. Bergin for Admission Pro Hac Vice File

10/7/2020: Notice of Notice of Application of R. Skinner, A. Roy, and J. Bergin for Admission Pro Hac Vice File

Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Darshan Mehan - Joint Stip Staying All Proceedings

10/8/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Darshan Mehan - Joint Stip Staying All Proceedings

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Darshan Mehan

8/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Darshan Mehan

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 11/16/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Compliance Hearing Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Joinder to Complex Designation Filed for United States Commodity Funds LLC, J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 10/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Darshan Mehan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Darshan Mehan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBBINS BRIAN JAMES