This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/16/2020 at 04:33:27 (UTC).

Medi/Rents Services & Supplies, Inc. VS Dansky

Case Summary

On 05/20/1997 Medi/Rents Services Supplies, Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Dansky. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN DOMBRINK and THE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1234

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEPHEN DOMBRINK

THE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Other

MEDI/RENTS SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.

Defendants, Debtor / Appellees and Cross Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA COLLECTIBLES, LLC.

DANSKY, STEPHEN

DANSKY, HARRY

Cross Defendants and Others

MILLS, HOWARD

MEDI/RENTS SERVICES & SUPPLIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEVINSON, EDWARD S.

KERSHNER, GARY R.

WALTERS, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

9/26/1997: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Judgment Entered

7/23/1997: Judgment Entered

Judgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

7/23/1997: Judgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

Request for Judgment Pursuant To Stipulation Filed for Medi/Rents Services & Supplies, Inc.

7/23/1997: Request for Judgment Pursuant To Stipulation Filed for Medi/Rents Services & Supplies, Inc.

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

7/21/1997: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Settlement Conference Statement Filed

7/15/1997: Settlement Conference Statement Filed

Settlement Conference Statement Filed

7/15/1997: Settlement Conference Statement Filed

Civil Jury Trial 07/28/1997 09:00 AM D- 18

7/3/1997: Civil Jury Trial 07/28/1997 09:00 AM D- 18

Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant

7/2/1997: Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant

Proof of Service on Motion

7/2/1997: Proof of Service on Motion

Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Filed for Defendant

7/1/1997: Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Filed for Defendant

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/11/1997 09:00 AM D- 2

6/30/1997: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/11/1997 09:00 AM D- 2

Notice of Order Filed

6/13/1997: Notice of Order Filed

Demurrer to Complaint Overruled

6/12/1997: Demurrer to Complaint Overruled

Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

6/12/1997: Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

Demurrer to Complaint Filed for Stephen Dansky , Harry Dansky

5/27/1997: Demurrer to Complaint Filed for Stephen Dansky , Harry Dansky

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

5/20/1997: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Stipulated Before Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/1997
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 07/28/1997 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/1997
  • DocketRequest for Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judgment Pursuant To Stipulation Filed for Medi/Rents Services & Supplies, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/1997
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: The Judge; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/1997
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Dropped from dept: 14 date: 07/18/1997 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/1997
  • DocketProof of Service on Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/1997
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to Stephen Dansky , Harry Dansky Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/1997
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in support To Demurrer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/1997
  • DocketDeclaration in Opposition To Demurrer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/1997
  • DocketDeclaration in Opposition To Demurrer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1997
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion 06/12/1997 09:00 AM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed for Stephen Dansky , Harry Dansky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less