This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 15:12:23 (UTC).

McDonald VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 McDonald filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1020

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Barr

Lynne McDonald

Defendants

CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

CITY OF OAKLAND

GALLAGHER & BURK INC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF OAKLAND

Cross Defendant and Defendant

GALLAGHER & BURK INC

Not Yet Classified

GALLAHER & BURK, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BARBARA J. PARKER

Jill Lifter

Jonathan Edmund Gertler

Kevin Peter McLaughlin

Richard Henry Schoenberger

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/3/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order re: Trial Setting Conference

04/14/2022: Order re: Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

04/14/2022: Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

03/30/2022: Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Kevin P. McLaughlin; Stipulation of Counsel; [Proposed] Order

03/30/2022: Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Kevin P. McLaughlin; Stipulation of Counsel; [Proposed] Order

Substitution of Attorney

01/19/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration of Service by Mail

08/18/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Proposed Order

07/23/2021: Proposed Order

Proof of Service on Motion

07/23/2021: Proof of Service on Motion

Declaration in Support

07/23/2021: Declaration in Support

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

07/23/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

Declaration of Service by Mail

06/03/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

10/21/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration in Support

09/30/2020: Declaration in Support

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

09/30/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

Declaration in Opposition Kevin P Mclaughlin

09/21/2020: Declaration in Opposition Kevin P Mclaughlin

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/17/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

282 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 04/14/2022 at 04:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 04/14/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Trial Setting Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 301 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/30/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/30/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 09:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/30/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
222 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for City of Oakland; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: Contra Costa County Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Contra Costa County Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 04/19/2019 02:30 PM D- 518; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lynne McDonald; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less