This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 07:05:58 (UTC).

McDaniel VS CAP IX- Dublin, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 McDaniel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAP IX- Dublin, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6512

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDANIEL , WINSTON

Defendant

CAP IX- DUBLIN, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RUBKE, MARK E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Winston McDaniel Filed

8/31/2021: Case Management Statement of Winston McDaniel Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/7/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/6/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

4/26/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/26/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

4/21/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Winston McDaniel

4/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Winston McDaniel

Summons Issued and Filed

4/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Winston McDaniel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Winston McDaniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBKE, MARK E.