Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 06:59:32 (UTC).

McCoy VS Cell Block Records, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/02/1997 McCoy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cell Block Records, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACQUELINE TABER and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1861

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wiley W Manuel Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACQUELINE TABER

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCOY, TRENTON L.

Defendants

KRASHNA, JON D.

BROWN, DAVID

THE DAVID BROWN MUSIC GROUP, INC.

CELL BLOCK RECORDS, INC.

KKR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHETTER, CARL F.

 

Court Documents

Answer To Complaint Filed for KKR Entertainment Group, Jon D. Krashna

7/2/1997: Answer To Complaint Filed for KKR Entertainment Group, Jon D. Krashna

Notice of Returned Check Issued and Filed

7/22/1997: Notice of Returned Check Issued and Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on for Entry of Default

8/20/1997: Rejection Letter Issued on for Entry of Default

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jon D. Krashna, Cell Block Records, Inc. Filed

10/29/1997: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jon D. Krashna, Cell Block Records, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The David Brown Music Group, Inc., Jon D. Krashna Filed

10/29/1997: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The David Brown Music Group, Inc., Jon D. Krashna Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to David Brown, Jon D. Krashna Filed

10/29/1997: Proof of Service on Complaint As to David Brown, Jon D. Krashna Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on for Entry of Default

11/19/1997: Rejection Letter Issued on for Entry of Default

Civil OSC - Complaints 10/27/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

9/30/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints 10/27/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

10/7/1998: Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

10/27/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

1/7/1999: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

4/16/1999: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

4/21/1999: Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

5/26/1999: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/1999
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/1999
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 05/21/1999 02:00 PM D- S-65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Status re:; Judge: Jacqueline Taber; Department: Dept S-65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/1999
  • DocketSanction Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/1999
  • DocketSanction Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/1999
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 04/16/1999 02:00 PM D- S-65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1999
  • DocketMinutes: FTC w/ Local Rules 5.0; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 10/27/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to David Brown, Jon D. Krashna Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The David Brown Music Group, Inc., Jon D. Krashna Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Jon D. Krashna, Cell Block Records, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Returned Check Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Complaint Filed for KKR Entertainment Group, Jon D. Krashna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/1997
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less