This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 15:59:42 (UTC).

Mayes-Harrison VS Sivret

Case Summary

On 05/23/2001 Mayes-Harrison filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sivret. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT C. BORRIS, JR., CHRISTINE K. MORUZA, JOHN J. FITZPATRICK, JR., DANIEL B. ALWEISS and BRADLEY BOSTICK,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1796

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT C. BORRIS, JR.

CHRISTINE K. MORUZA

JOHN J. FITZPATRICK, JR.

DANIEL B. ALWEISS

BRADLEY BOSTICK,

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

MAYES-HARRISON, LASHONDA

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

SIVRET, PHIL

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

5/23/2001: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

6/12/2001: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Phil Sivret

6/14/2001: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Phil Sivret

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

7/20/2001: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

7/20/2001: Judgment Entered

Small Claims Appeal 08/24/2001 09:00 AM D- 704

7/27/2001: Small Claims Appeal 08/24/2001 09:00 AM D- 704

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Phil Sivret

8/9/2001: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Phil Sivret

Request Re: Postponement Granted

8/17/2001: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Appeal 09/28/2001 03:00 PM D- 704

9/6/2001: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Appeal 09/28/2001 03:00 PM D- 704

Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

9/28/2001: Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

9/28/2001: Judgment Entered

OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

1/3/2002: OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

Order of Examination Issued

7/3/2002: Order of Examination Issued

Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed

7/31/2002: Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed

OEX - Dropped - Invalid Proof of Service

8/27/2002: OEX - Dropped - Invalid Proof of Service

Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/3/2002: Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Order of Examination Issued

9/23/2002: Order of Examination Issued

Writ of Execution Issued To Alameda

9/26/2002: Writ of Execution Issued To Alameda

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Lashonda Mayes-Harrison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2002
  • DocketMinutes: Judgment for Plaintiff on Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Christine K. Moruza; Department: Dept 704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Sworn, Examined, and Ordered Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Lashonda Mayes-Harrison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • DocketProof of Service on Order of Examination Valid As to Phil Sivret

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Order of Examination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • DocketOrder of Examination Hearing Dropped from dept: 704 date: 09/27/2002 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • DocketOrder of Examination 11/15/2002 09:00 AM D- 704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 07/20/2001 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for Phil Sivret

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2001
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Phil Sivret

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/06/2001 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2001
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 06/22/2001 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less