Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 00:56:01 (UTC).

Maximo Investments LLC VS De Montfort LLC

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Maximo Investments LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against De Montfort LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. MARKMAN, FRANK ROESCH, NOEL WISE and NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4694

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

FRANK ROESCH

NOEL WISE

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

NAVONE, MICHAEL

SOWERS, JOHN

DASH STRATEGIES LLC

MAXIMO INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants and Others

ESTHER EAMES LLC

DE MONTFORT LLC

COURTHOUSE VENTURES,INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REZAIAN, MOHAMMED

DAVIS, BRENDA

FORSBLAD, LARRY

CRADY, MARK

WORKING DIRT, LLC

FARAG, ABRAHAM

KINNEY, JILL

GONZALEZ, JAIME

TRUESDELL, CLAUDIA

FORSBLAD, SARAH

WORKING DIRT R2, LLC

Others

ESTER EAMES, LLC

PECHERER, MICHEAL S

CRADY, MARK

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRAVES, BENJAMIN C.

COLLINS, JOHN MARSHALL

SCHAEFER, BARRETT R. P.

BRODEHL, KEVIN R.

PECHERER, MICHAEL S.

COLLA, NICHOLAS

CHIARELLI ESQ, EUGENE J.

KELLER, IVO

HARDIMAN, ALEX D.

RODMAN, JORDAN A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/2/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/12/2018 09:00 AM D- 24

8/2/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 12/12/2018 09:00 AM D- 24

Proof of Service on Motion

8/26/2020: Proof of Service on Motion

Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for Maximo Investments LLC, Michael Navone, John S

3/5/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for Maximo Investments LLC, Michael Navone, John S

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/5/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

2/21/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Esther Eames LLC

12/20/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Esther Eames LLC

Summons Issued and Filed

10/16/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Proposed Order Filed

6/20/2019: Proposed Order Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Courthouse Ventures,Inc.,a California Corporation

5/1/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Courthouse Ventures,Inc.,a California Corporation

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/14/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Ex-Parte 11/15/2018 04:00 PM D- 24

11/13/2018: Civil Ex-Parte 11/15/2018 04:00 PM D- 24

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

10/16/2018: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

10/16/2018: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Proposed Order Received

8/27/2018: Proposed Order Received

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: Dismissal; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/02/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Jaime Gonzalez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Exonerating Receiver's Undertaking Nunc-Pro-Tunc as of 01/17/2021 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
459 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Stipulation for Limited Interlocutory Order of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Esther Eames LLC Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Esther Eames LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Ex-Parte 08/08/2018 04:00 PM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketOther Ex Parte Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 08/07/2018 time: 04:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/12/2018 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maximo Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORKING DIRT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DE MONTFORT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ESTHER EAMES LLC is a litigant