This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 17:11:34 (UTC).

Matter of Sharon Banker Wells

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Matter of Sharon Banker Wells was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2143

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WELLS, CARTER

Decedent

WELLS, SHARON BANKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REED, JAMES E.

 

Court Documents

Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed

6/14/2021: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Carter Wells

7/23/2021: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Carter Wells

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Carter Wells

7/22/2021: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Carter Wells

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 201; Action: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Carter Wells

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Carter Wells

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProbate 01/31/2022 01:30 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED, JAMES E.