This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 01:33:54 (UTC).

Matter of Maria Lilian Ganem

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Matter of Maria Lilian Ganem was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUBEN SUNDEEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2571

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RUBEN SUNDEEN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SILIEZAR, EDWIN CINEO

SILIEZAR, JORGE AMERICO

SILIEZAR, JOSE EDUARDO

SILIEZAR, WALTER ALBERTO

SILIEZAR, AMADA PRIMAVERA

Decedent

GANEM, MARIA LILIAN

 

Court Documents

Examiner's Notes: Succession to Real Property 12/4/2019

12/3/2019: Examiner's Notes: Succession to Real Property 12/4/2019

Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

12/4/2019: Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed

Order Determining Succession to Real Property Filed

12/4/2019: Order Determining Succession to Real Property Filed

Proposed Order Received

9/3/2019: Proposed Order Received

Notice of Hearing Returned without Proof of Service Filed for Walter Alberto Siliezar, Amada Primave

9/3/2019: Notice of Hearing Returned without Proof of Service Filed for Walter Alberto Siliezar, Amada Primave

Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed

8/26/2019: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property; Judge: Ruben Sundeen; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Determining Succession to Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession to Real Property Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes: Succession to Real Property 12/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned without Proof of Service Filed for Walter Alberto Siliezar, Amada Primave

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketProbate 12/04/2019 09:30 AM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less