This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 04:25:02 (UTC).

Matsui VS Beard

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Matsui filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Beard. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7141

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOWNHOWER, JERRY

MATSUI, MARGARET

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.

AMERICAN CONTRACTOR'S INDEMNITY COMPANY

BEARD, GERGORY EARL

C.H. ROOFING, INC.

FIELDS, ROBERT MICHAEL

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RICE, MARK J.

HUDSON, GEOFFREY R.

SOSA, CARLOS E.

COELHO, CLAY A.

MOORE, ALEXANDER R

WOO, AMBER N

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint Filed for American Contractor's Indemnity Company

9/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for American Contractor's Indemnity Company

Answer to Complaint Filed for Gergory Earl Beard

9/29/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Gergory Earl Beard

Answer to Complaint Filed for C.H. Roofing, Inc.

9/21/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for C.H. Roofing, Inc.

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Old Republic Surety Company

9/1/2021: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Old Republic Surety Company

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.

8/25/2021: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.

Cross-Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

8/16/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

8/16/2021: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

Summons Issued and Filed

8/16/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gergory Earl Beard Filed

8/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gergory Earl Beard Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to American Contractor's Indemnity Company Filed

8/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to American Contractor's Indemnity Company Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. Filed

8/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Old Republic Surety Company Filed

8/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Old Republic Surety Company Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/30/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

7/30/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Margaret Matsui

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Margaret Matsui

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/2/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

8/2/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed

8/5/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Gergory Earl Beard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for American Contractor's Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for C.H. Roofing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Old Republic Surety Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Gergory Earl Beard Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Robert Michael Fields Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Old Republic Surety Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to American Contractor's Indemnity Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Margaret Matsui

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant