This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/04/2020 at 10:53:41 (UTC).

Mass VS The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 Mass filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN, WINIFRED Y. SMITH and ROBERT MCGUINESS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9223

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

ROBERT MCGUINESS

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MASS, JASON

GRAF, KAREN

Respondents

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

NAPOLITANO, JANET A.

DUCKETT, DWAINE B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GREENOUGH, MARGO HASSELMAN

FRISCH, ELEANOR E.

RICHTER, KAI H

BROME, DANIEL

SHARP, J. DANIEL

ROBINSON, CHARLES F.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 01/09/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

10/24/2017: Case Management Conference 01/09/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 01/26/2018 09:00 AM D- 21

12/13/2017: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 01/26/2018 09:00 AM D- 21

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/26/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/26/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/21/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/21/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/3/2018: Tentative Case Management Order

Re-Notice of re: Deliveryof original sealed Filed

2/19/2020: Re-Notice of re: Deliveryof original sealed Filed

Motion for Class Certification Filed for Petitioner

1/23/2020: Motion for Class Certification Filed for Petitioner

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/12/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

5/3/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Proof of Service by Mail / Electronic Mail Filed

4/26/2019: Proof of Service by Mail / Electronic Mail Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted

1/3/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted

Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed

8/24/2018: Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Regents of the University of California Filed

11/6/2017: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Regents of the University of California Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

6/4/2018: Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed

8/6/2018: Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/6/2018: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Class Certification Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/17/2020 11:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Class Certification; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttendance Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Class Certification Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear By Telephone Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The Regents of the University of California Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Janet A. Napolitano Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 01/09/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 12/12/2017 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jason Mass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.