This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/22/2023 at 23:55:28 (UTC).

Martinez VS Ware Malcomb

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Martinez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Ware Malcomb. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Somnath Raj Chatterjee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2444

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Somnath Raj Chatterjee

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

WARE MALCOMB, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Amy P Frenzen

Beatriz Martinez

Issa Azat, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/24/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/24/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/8/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission re Notice of Case Management Conference Order and Notice

9/23/2020: Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission re Notice of Case Management Conference Order and Notice

Initial Case Management Conference 02/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

9/18/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 02/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Minute Order (Court Order)

04/13/2022: Minute Order (Court Order)

Request for Dismissal

04/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

03/03/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

02/25/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

02/23/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Exhibit List

02/09/2022: Exhibit List

Separate Statement

02/09/2022: Separate Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

02/09/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WARE MALCOMBS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

02/09/2022: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WARE MALCOMBS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service by Mail

02/09/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion for Summary Judgment

02/09/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for Defendant Ware Malcomb

01/21/2022: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for Defendant Ware Malcomb

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/09/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 03/23/2022 to 04/14/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Filed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Martinez on 09/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Beatriz Martinez as to the entire action; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 302 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/13/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Court Order); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: NOTE: (*MSC set for April 20, 2022 in Dept. 302 at 9:00AM via BlueJeans Video Conference); Category: Case Note

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Beatriz Martinez (Plaintiff) As to: Ware Malcomb, a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Ware Malcomb, a California corporation Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ware Malcomb, a California corporation; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission re Notice of Case Management Conference Order and Notice; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 02/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 517; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Beatriz Martinez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less