This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 03:32:28 (UTC).

Martinez VS Martinez

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Martinez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Martinez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4158

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTINEZ, JESSICA

Respondent

MARTINEZ, PEDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DOOLITTLE, WALLACE C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Pedro Martinez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Pedro Martinez Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOOLITTLE WALLACE CHARLES