Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 21:55:20 (UTC).

Marshall VS Hester

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Marshall filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Hester. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONNI MACLAREN and JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7808

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONNI MACLAREN

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MARSHALL, WALTER G.

HESTER, ERNEST A.

HESTER, LEONARD JR.

HESTER, MICHAEL B.

HESTER, MARK D.

HESTER, LARRY D.

THE WALTER GRAY MARSHALL LIVING TRUST

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

20, ROES 1

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HESTER, ERNEST A.

HESTER, LEONARD JR.

ALEXANDER, RYAN

HESTER, MICHAEL B.

HESTER, LARRY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER, RYAN

HESTER, LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROCKWELL, LAWRENCE K.

WONG, JONATHAN MCNEIL

HUNTER II, ROBERT B

KENNEDY, STEPHEN J.

SETO, STEPHEN C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/14/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/14/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/26/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/25/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/25/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Fidelity National Title Company

2/26/2021: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Fidelity National Title Company

Case Management Statement of Larry Hester Filed

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement of Larry Hester Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

7/30/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Intent to appear by telephone at 3/20/2020 hearing Filed

5/11/2020: Notice of Intent to appear by telephone at 3/20/2020 hearing Filed

Case Management Statement of Walter G. Marshall Filed

2/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Walter G. Marshall Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Ryan Alexander Filed

1/10/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Ryan Alexander Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

12/6/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Demurrer - Overruled

12/13/2019: Demurrer - Overruled

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/27/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

8/16/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Larry Hester Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ryan Alexander Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Walter G. Marshall Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for Fidelity National Title Company

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDemurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 09/18/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Michael B. Hester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDemurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 08/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Leonard Hester Jr., Ernest A. Hester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/18/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for WWalter G. Marshall

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG, JONATHAN MCNEIL