Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 07:47:18 (UTC).

Marah VS Paul

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Marah filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Paul. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5349

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARAH , MIERRA

Defendants

ALAMEDA MORTGAGE CORPORATION

PAUL , REGINALD

M&T BANK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HORNER, CLIFFORD R

 

Court Documents

Substitute True Name for Doe Defendant Filed

4/27/2021: Substitute True Name for Doe Defendant Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Reginald Paul Filed

4/27/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Reginald Paul Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alameda Mortgage Corporation Filed

4/27/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alameda Mortgage Corporation Filed

Dismissal As to Defendant: Alameda Mortgage Corporation Entered

4/30/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: Alameda Mortgage Corporation Entered

Initial Case Management Conference 08/31/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

4/15/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/31/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/15/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/14/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mierra Marah

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mierra Marah

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

4/14/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Alameda Mortgage Corporation Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alameda Mortgage Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Reginald Paul Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitute True Name for Doe Defendant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/31/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mierra Marah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORNER, CLIFFORD R