This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 00:04:14 (UTC).

Manjivar VS RWW Properties, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 Manjivar filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RWW Properties, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENTRISH A SATARZADEH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9838

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BENTRISH A SATARZADEH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANJIVAR, JONATHAN CRUZ

RODRIGUEZ, CARMEN

Defendant

RWW PROPERTIES, LLC

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Jonathan Cruz Manjivar Filed

5/13/2020: Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Jonathan Cruz Manjivar Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/14/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

6/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/14/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

1/15/2020: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

4/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 04/15/2020 time: 09:00 AM

1/3/2020: Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 04/15/2020 time: 09:00 AM

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

1/8/2020: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

1/3/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 01/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

10/16/2019: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 01/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/5/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 519; Action: Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/14/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Jonathan Cruz Manjivar Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/12/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish A Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 04/15/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 01/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Carmen Rodriguez Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Carmen Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Jonathan Cruz Manjivar Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Jonathan Cruz Manjivar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 10/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less