Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 14:20:38 (UTC).

Maloney VS Reck

Case Summary

On 02/02/1999 Maloney filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Reck. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ARLENE KOCK and ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8389

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ARLENE KOCK

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALONEY, GENE V.

Defendant

RECK, WALLACE

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/2/1999: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

2/8/1999: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Wallace Reck

3/29/1999: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Wallace Reck

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

4/8/1999: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

4/8/1999: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

4/29/1999: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

4/29/1999: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

4/29/1999: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

5/27/1999: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

5/27/1999: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

7/7/1999: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/1999
  • Docket* ALL DEPARTMENT NUMBERS CHANGED DUE TO UNIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock; Department: Dept 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • Docket* Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 2 date: 05/27/1999 time: 03:00 PM [*D-702]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock; Department: Dept 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1999
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 2 date: 04/29/1999 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for Wallace Reck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/1999
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Valid As to Wallace Reck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/1999
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 04/08/1999 03:00 PM D- 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less