This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 02:45:53 (UTC).

Major VS Changes Case Management Eastmont Mall

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Major filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Changes Case Management Eastmont Mall. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WINIFRED Y. SMITH and RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5434

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAJOR, DAWNE MICHELLE

MAJOR, DAWNE M.

Defendant

CHANGES CASE MANAGEMENT EASTMONT MALL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/3/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/3/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

10/15/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/27/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

6/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/12/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/23/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/23/2019: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

10/24/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 02/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/24/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Civil Rights Filed

9/17/2019: Complaint - Civil Rights Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/17/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dawne Michelle Major

9/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dawne Michelle Major

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/05/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 10/23/2019 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Dawne Michelle Major Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Dawne Michelle Major

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dawne Michelle Major

    Read MoreRead Less