Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 16:44:37 (UTC).

Machado VS WFG National Title Company of California, a Calif

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Machado filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WFG National Title Company of California, a Calif. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0652

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

MACHADO, ELVECIO

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

CALCULATED RISK ANALYTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WFG NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PAVLIC, MARYLINE

MACHADO, ALEXANDRE

MORENO, CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHAUMAN, WILLIAM F.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/5/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/11/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Judgment Entered

3/1/2021: Judgment Entered

Case Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

3/2/2021: Case Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

3/4/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Carlos Moreno Filed

2/23/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Carlos Moreno Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

2/17/2021: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Calculated Risk Analytics, LLC, a Califor

1/4/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Calculated Risk Analytics, LLC, a Califor

Case Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alexandre Machado Filed

10/1/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alexandre Machado Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maryline Pavlic Filed

10/1/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maryline Pavlic Filed

Case Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party WFG National Title Company of California,

7/28/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party WFG National Title Company of California,

Dismissal As to Defendant: WFG National Title Company of California, a California Corporation Entere

8/3/2020: Dismissal As to Defendant: WFG National Title Company of California, a California Corporation Entere

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Elvecio Machado

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Elvecio Machado

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Motion to Vacate/Set Aside

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Vacate/Set Aside Hearing Confirmed for 05/27/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Vacate/Set Aside Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Carlos Moreno Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Elvecio Machado Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: WFG National Title Company of California, a California Corporation Entere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party WFG National Title Company of California,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 520 date: 08/27/2020 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/23/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Elvecio Machado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALCULATED RISK ANALYTICS LLC DBA EXCELERATE CAPITAL A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WFG NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHAUMAN, WILLIAM F.