This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 05:34:36 (UTC).

Luong VS Banh

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Luong filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Banh. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3444

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUONG, HUNG KIET KENNETH

Defendants

BANH , HUNG QUOC

BANH, CUONG QUOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BORNSTEIN, JONATHAN HERSCHEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/2/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

7/2/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees Filed

6/30/2021: Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hung Kiet Kenneth Luong

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hung Kiet Kenneth Luong

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

6/30/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/30/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Advance Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hung Kiet Kenneth Luong

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORNSTEIN, JONATHAN HERSCHEL