This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 03:28:59 (UTC).

Lubkeman VS Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Lubkeman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT MCGUINESS and THOMAS RASCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8069

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT MCGUINESS

THOMAS RASCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HYDROPONIC SOCIETY OF AMERICA, INC.

LUBKEMAN, DAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HALEY, MATTHEW D.

ROSS, JASON J.M.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

11/24/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Compliance Hearing 11/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

9/11/2020: Compliance Hearing 11/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

Notice of Settlement Filed for Dan Lubkeman

9/3/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Dan Lubkeman

Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

8/31/2020: Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed

8/31/2020: Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

8/31/2020: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of America, Inc. Filed

8/20/2020: Case Management Statement of Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of America, Inc. Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Statement of Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of America, Inc. Filed

8/28/2019: Case Management Statement of Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of America, Inc. Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

8/28/2019: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of America, Inc.

8/29/2019: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of America, Inc.

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of A

8/30/2019: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Dan Lubkeman, Hydroponic Society of A

Case Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc Filed

9/11/2019: Case Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/19/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/19/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc

6/12/2019: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

6/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 11/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 22 date: 09/14/2020 time: 08:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Dan Lubkeman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 22 date: 09/04/2020 time: 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Settlement Conference; Judge: Thomas Rasch; Department: Dept 303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDept. 303 sign in sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/19/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dan Lubkeman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALEY, MATTHEW D.