This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 08:56:44 (UTC).

Lowe VS Paul

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Lowe filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Paul. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENTRISH SATARZADEH and PELAYO A. LLAMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6165

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BENTRISH SATARZADEH

PELAYO A. LLAMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOWE, DALLAS

Defendant

PAUL, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

8/26/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

8/26/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/26/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

4/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/26/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1/22/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

1/22/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/10/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Pelayo A. Llamas; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/26/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 05/13/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Michael Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 01/22/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less