This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 07:41:34 (UTC).

Lopez VS Lopez

Case Summary

On 09/10/2008 Lopez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Lopez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES SMILEY, JOHN PORTER and DOUGLAS UNSWORTH, PORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8793

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

CHARLES SMILEY

JOHN PORTER

DOUGLAS UNSWORTH, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, RUBIN

Respondent

LOPEZ, AMALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PRESTO III, FRANK D

ALCABES, JAIME A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2009
  • DocketOrder After Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention; Judge: John Porter; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention; Judge: Douglas Unsworth, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing 02/26/2009 08:30 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketReissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention; Judge: Charles Smiley; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • DocketMediation Report Received

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2008
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Rubin Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - CLETS on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Amalia Lo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • DocketAnswer to Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Filed for Amalia Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • DocketMiscellaneous TRO Granted Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • DocketReferred to Child Custody Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • DocketDomestic Violence Hearing 10/02/2008 08:30 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence) and Notice of Hearing Filed for Rubin Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • DocketRequest for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Presto, Frank D III