This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 09:11:34 (UTC).

Lopez Breganza VS M&M Bakery Products

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Lopez Breganza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against M M Bakery Products. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3818

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

LOPEZ BREGANZA, JULIO RENE

ORDONEZ, CLAUDIA

RODRIGUEZ OYUELA, CLELIA ALEXANIA

ORDEONEZ, CLAUDIA

FLORES, ENELIN ALEXANIA

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Plaintiffs

CRAWFORD, WILLIE DAVID

M&M BAKERY PRODUCTS

MAGGIORA BAKING COMPANY

ORDONEZ, CLAUDIA

CHAVEZ , JAIME

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

M&M BAKERY PRODUCTS

MAGGIORA BAKING COMPANY

CRAWFORD , WILLIE DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MOGHADAM, KOUROSH DANESH

SIMONSON, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

9/22/2021: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

9/22/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

9/22/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/1/2021: Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for M&M Bakery Products, Maggiora Baking Company , Willie David Crawfor

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for M&M Bakery Products, Maggiora Baking Company , Willie David Crawfor

Summons Issued and Filed

8/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of of Jury fee Deposit Filed

8/27/2021: Notice of of Jury fee Deposit Filed

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

8/27/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for M&M Bakery Products

8/27/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for M&M Bakery Products

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Willie David Crawford Filed

8/5/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Willie David Crawford Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maggiora Baking Company Filed

8/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maggiora Baking Company Filed

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

7/13/2021: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

7/7/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/7/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/6/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

7/6/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Julio Rene Lopez Breganza

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Julio Rene Lopez Breganza

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Clelia Alexania Rodriguez Oyuela

7/6/2021: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Clelia Alexania Rodriguez Oyuela

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Jury fee Deposit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for M&M Bakery Products, Maggiora Baking Company , Willie David Crawfor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for M&M Bakery Products, Maggiora Baking Company , Willie David Crawford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Willie David Crawford Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Maggiora Baking Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Willie David Crawford Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Enelin Alexania Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Julio Rene Lopez Breganza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&M BAKERY PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONSON, JOHN S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOGHADAM, KOUROSH DANESH