This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/10/2021 at 09:08:44 (UTC).

Lombardi VS W & R Transport

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Lombardi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against W R Transport. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9145

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOMBARDI, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

BALANI, AHMED

ALTAII, WALAA

W & R TRANSPORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GINSBURG, WILLIAM S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/19/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

5/19/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/12/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christopher Lombardi

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christopher Lombardi

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

5/12/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

6/8/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Walaa Altaii Filed

6/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Walaa Altaii Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ahmed Balani Filed

6/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ahmed Balani Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to W & R Transport Filed

6/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to W & R Transport Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Walaa Altaii Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Ahmed Balani Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to W & R Transport Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christopher Lombardi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINSBURG, WILLIAM S