This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 06:34:34 (UTC).

Logan VS Community Association Management

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Logan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Community Association Management. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8698

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGAN, KELLI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT

STONERIDGE TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

ARBORWELL, INC.

Cross Defendant

1-20, INCLUSIVE, ROES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BUCHANAN, RYAN

PATERSON, NAIRI

HERP, PAUL A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/15/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/15/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

12/2/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Arborwell, Inc. Filed

3/29/2021: Case Management Statement of Arborwell, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Community Association Management, Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Ass

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement of Community Association Management, Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Ass

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Association, Inc. Filed

2/16/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Association, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arborwell, Inc. Filed

2/16/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arborwell, Inc. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Arborwell, Inc.

3/15/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Arborwell, Inc.

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed

3/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Community Association Management, Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' As

3/19/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Community Association Management, Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' As

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

3/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Statement of Kelli Logan Filed

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement of Kelli Logan Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

1/8/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

1/8/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Case Management Statement of Kelli Logan Filed

11/25/2020: Case Management Statement of Kelli Logan Filed

Re-Notice of jury fees Filed

11/25/2020: Re-Notice of jury fees Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 03/28/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 03/18/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/20/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Community Association Management, Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Ass

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Community Association Management Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Community Association Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Community Association Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kelli Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where ARBORWELL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHANAN, RYAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATERSON, NAIRI