This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 20:52:34 (UTC).

Livermore Auto Group VS Vanhattem

Case Summary

On 09/30/2008 Livermore Auto Group filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Vanhattem. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN PORTER and DAVID MAKMAN, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2357

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN PORTER

DAVID MAKMAN, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIVERMORE AUTO GROUP

Debtor / Appellees and Defendants

VANHATTEM, REBECCA J.

VANHATTEM, WILLIAM J.

 

Court Documents

Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

1/14/2019: Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed

1/14/2019: Application and Renewal of Judgment Filed

Judgment Entered

1/14/2019: Judgment Entered

Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed

2/14/2019: Proof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Contra Costa Filed

4/2/2019: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Contra Costa Filed

Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

5/3/2019: Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

Proof of Service Filed

11/13/2019: Proof of Service Filed

Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

2/26/2020: Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

7/10/2020: Memo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/30/2008: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

11/26/2008: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/2/2008: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Miscellaneous Stipulation for Court-Appointed Temporary Judge Filed

12/2/2008: Miscellaneous Stipulation for Court-Appointed Temporary Judge Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/04/2009 02:00 PM D- 702

1/5/2009: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/04/2009 02:00 PM D- 702

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

3/3/2009: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

3/4/2009: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

3/4/2009: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

3/4/2009: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSC Abstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketSC Abstract of Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Judgment and Debt Recovery Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Unsatisfied from Contra Costa Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/04/2009 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Stipulation for Court-Appointed Temporary Judge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: David Makman, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 702 date: 01/07/2009 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 11/26/2008 09:00 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Livermore Auto Group, INC. is a litigant