This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 19:00:02 (UTC).

Liberty Mutual Canada VS AMAC Logistics, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Liberty Mutual Canada filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMAC Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3089

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBERTY MUTUAL CANADA

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

HELIOSPHERE, INC.

AMAC LOGISTICS, LLC

Silvestre F. Guadarrama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Frank X. Dipolito

Joshua E Kirsch

Miles L. Kavaller

Paul Jacobs

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/21/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/21/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/17/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Request for Dismissal

04/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Service by Mail

02/18/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Request for Judicial Notice

06/25/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Compliance Hearing 06/21/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

08/16/2021: Compliance Hearing 06/21/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

08/10/2021: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to cross-complaint

08/11/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to cross-complaint

Dismissal As to Defendant: AMAC Logistics, LLC, Silvestre F. Guadarrama Entered 010 Dismissal - As To Party

07/08/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: AMAC Logistics, LLC, Silvestre F. Guadarrama Entered 010 Dismissal - As To Party

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party AMAC Logistics, LLC, Silvestre F. Guadar Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - party

07/01/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party AMAC Logistics, LLC, Silvestre F. Guadar Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - party

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

07/01/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to cross-complaint

07/02/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to cross-complaint

Case Management Conference Order Issued

02/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

02/18/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Liberty Mutual Canada Filed

02/03/2021: Case Management Statement of Liberty Mutual Canada Filed

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/05/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Liberty mutual canada on 05/11/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Liberty Mutual Canada as to the entire action; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Liberty Mutual Canada (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 06/21/2022 02:30 PM D- 521; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 521 date: 07/01/2022 time: 10:00 AM; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 06/21/2022 time: 09:00 AM; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 521 date: 04/12/2022 time: 02:30 PM; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Agreement of Counsel for Electronic Service Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice; Category: REQ087

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMessage: Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Silvestre F. Guadarrama, Heliosphere, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMessage: Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 10/14/2020 02:30 PM D- 521; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Silvestre F. Guadarrama Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 10/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 521; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Liberty Mutual Canada; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAC LOGISTICS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HELIOSPHERE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIPOLITO, FRANK X.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRSCH JOSHUA ERIK