This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 06:23:37 (UTC).

Li VS Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Li filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4258

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LI, MARGARET

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

ZIEGLER, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DEPAUL, MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/30/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 25

9/30/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 25

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Margaret Li

9/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Margaret Li

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

9/29/2021: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/29/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Margaret Li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEPAUL, MICHAEL J