Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 07:57:42 (UTC).

Leung VS Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., INC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Leung filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales, U S A , INC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3186

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEUNG, JAMES

Defendants

DOE 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROSENSTEIN, MICHAEL H.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., INC Filed

4/5/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., INC Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

3/26/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Leung

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Leung

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/26/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

3/30/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/30/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., INC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Leung

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENSTEIN MICHAEL HARRIS