Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 00:50:27 (UTC).

Lenthe VS Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 Lenthe filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. MARKMAN and JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4284

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LENTHE, MYCALAH

LENTHE, HUNTER

Defendants

YAMAHA MOTOR MAUFACTURING CORPORATION OF AMERICA,

YAMAHA MOTOR CORPORATION, USA, INC.

YAMAHA MOTOR CO., LTD.

EAST BAY MOTORSPORTS, INC.

YAMAHA MOTOR MANUFACTURING CORPORATION OF AMERICA,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHOENBERGER, RICHARD H.

BACK, MARY KATHERINE

ADAMS, KATHARINE H.

ADAMS, LINDSEY R.

PURCELL, THOMAS

KNOTTNERUS, JOHN W.

KLIEBENSTEIN, NEIL M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/3/2021: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

10/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

10/14/2020: Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed

9/14/2020: Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

9/8/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed

7/20/2020: Case Management Statement of East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

4/24/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/3/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

3/3/2020: Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Co

1/27/2020: Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Co

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

1/7/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corpora

1/7/2020: Case Management Statement of Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corpora

Answer to Complaint Filed for Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America,, Yamaha Motor Corpo

10/15/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America,, Yamaha Motor Corpo

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Filed

9/27/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Filed

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Status re: Payment of Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint - Product Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America,, Yamaha Motor Corpo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Co., LTD. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to East Bay Motorsports, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hunter Lenthe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Product Liability Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST BAY MOTORSPORTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where YAMAHA MOTOR MANUFACTURING CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adams, Katharine H.