This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 08:43:08 (UTC).

LEE VS RECINOS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2000 LEE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RECINOS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTINE K. MORUZA and HARRY R. SHEPPARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8323

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

CHRISTINE K. MORUZA

HARRY R. SHEPPARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, YONG OK

Defendants

RECINOS, CARLOS

MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE, HAEYOUNG

TAK S. CHANG

FRANKEL, RICHARD A

JEFFREY L. ADAMS

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Re: File Amended Complaint Filed for MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES

8/3/2001: Stipulation and Order Re: File Amended Complaint Filed for MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES

Stipulation and Order Re: File Amended Complaint Granted

8/6/2001: Stipulation and Order Re: File Amended Complaint Granted

First Amended Complaint Filed

8/10/2001: First Amended Complaint Filed

Notice of unavailability of council Filed

8/29/2001: Notice of unavailability of council Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES

9/7/2001: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES

Status Conference Statement Filed for Defendant

9/17/2001: Status Conference Statement Filed for Defendant

Case Management Statement of YONG OK LEE Filed

9/19/2001: Case Management Statement of YONG OK LEE Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

9/24/2001: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

Miscellaneous Case Management Conference Order Filed

9/24/2001: Miscellaneous Case Management Conference Order Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

10/1/2001: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/17/2002 04:00 PM D- 704

12/24/2001: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/17/2002 04:00 PM D- 704

Case Management Statement of MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES Filed

1/8/2002: Case Management Statement of MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

1/17/2002: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

3/29/2002: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2002
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed for Plaintiff Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2002
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/18/2002 04:00 PM D- 704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2002
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Christine K. Moruza; Department: Dept 704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/17/2002 04:00 PM D- 704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Harry R. Sheppard; Department: Dept 705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Case Management Conference Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint Filed, Date of Service: AS TO RICHARD GRECO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint Filed, Date of Service: AS TO CARLOS RECINOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2000
  • DocketGeneral Denial FILED BY DEF MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES, FEE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2000
  • DocketCase Management Conference 07/19/2000 09:00 AM D-705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint Filed, Date of Service: AS TO MICRO DENTAL LABORATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint Filed, Date of Service: AS TO CARLOS RECINOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2000
  • DocketInitial Filing Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Micro Labs USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, JEFFREY L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, HaeYoung