This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 09:47:09 (UTC).

Lee VS CBS Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Lee filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CBS Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8733

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE, MICHAEL

WEGRECKY, CHRISTY

LEE, DIANNE

BOEHM, JEAN

Defendants

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

CRANE CO.

CBS CORPORATION

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

JOHNSON, DEREK S.

TURNER, GLEN

DAVIS, GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 04/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

2/22/2021: Case Management Conference 04/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Order Re Initial Case Management Order Asbestos Filed

2/22/2021: Order Re Initial Case Management Order Asbestos Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Crane Co.

4/1/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Crane Co.

Answer to Complaint Filed for The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company

3/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company

Notice of Filed

3/23/2021: Notice of Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Honeywell International, Inc.

3/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Honeywell International, Inc.

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed

3/23/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for General Electric Company

3/24/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for General Electric Company

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company Filed

3/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Honeywell International, Inc. Filed

3/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Honeywell International, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to General Electric Company Filed

3/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to General Electric Company Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to CBS Corporation Filed

3/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to CBS Corporation Filed

Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

2/22/2021: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

Order Order Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed

2/22/2021: Order Order Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed

Preliminary Fact Sheet New Filing - Asbestos Litigation Filed

2/22/2021: Preliminary Fact Sheet New Filing - Asbestos Litigation Filed

Complaint Asbestos Filed

2/10/2021: Complaint Asbestos Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/10/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dianne Lee

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dianne Lee

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Crane Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 05/28/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for General Electric Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Honeywell International, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The GoodYear Tire & Rubber Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Re Initial Case Management Order Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Order Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 04/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dianne Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant