This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 07:18:38 (UTC).

Le VS The Regents of the University of Califonria

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Le filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against The Regents of the University of Califonria. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1416

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LE, LOAN

Defendant

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFONRIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MEYERS, TANYA R.

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 04/12/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

9/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 04/12/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/1/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/31/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Loan Le

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Loan Le

Complaint - Defamation Filed

8/31/2021: Complaint - Defamation Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/12/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Loan Le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Defamation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYERS, TANYA R.