This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 20:15:23 (UTC).

Latimer VS Swift

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Latimer filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Swift. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2992

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dolores Latimer

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY SET FORTH IN THIS COMPLAINT

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC.

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, INC.

Timothy Swift

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Camille Milder

James F Lewin

James J. Jirn

Michael Palmer

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

2/23/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Settlement

05/20/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement

05/16/2022: Order Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement

Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Dept 303 sign in sheet

05/16/2022: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Dept 303 sign in sheet

Order Judge's Memo to Clerk (Settled in full

05/16/2022: Order Judge's Memo to Clerk (Settled in full

Minute Order (Pre-Trial Settlement Conference)

05/16/2022: Minute Order (Pre-Trial Settlement Conference)

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

05/11/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

05/09/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Hearing

04/06/2022: Notice of Hearing

Case Management Order

03/10/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

03/10/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

03/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Settlement Filed by: Dolores Latimer (Plaintiff) Vacate Future Dates: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303 updated: Result Date to 05/16/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Pre-Trial Settlement Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Dept 303 sign in sheet Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order Judge's Memo to Clerk (Settled in full Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 05/11/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/11/2022 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Timothy Swift (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Timothy Swift; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Re: Answer to Complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for JPMORGAN Chase Bank, N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 10/22/2020 02:30 PM D- 521; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dolores Latimer; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Other Real Property Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS INC. (MERS) is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Reconveyance Company Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant