This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 23:50:44 (UTC).

Kugel VS Build Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Kugel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Build Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1364

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUGEL, KENNETH

Defendants

BUILD GROUP, INC.

STANDARD DRYWALL, INC.

Other

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NELSON, ROBERT M.

JACOBSEN, KAREN L

SELL, JAMES E

HUGHES, DAVID W

HAMANT, CANDICE N.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

11/10/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kenneth Kugel

11/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kenneth Kugel

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/10/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/7/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

12/7/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Answer to Complaint Filed for Standard Drywall, Inc.

1/29/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Standard Drywall, Inc.

Answer to Complaint Filed for Build Group, Inc.

1/25/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Build Group, Inc.

Application Re: Lien Filed for Cypress Insurance Company

2/16/2021: Application Re: Lien Filed for Cypress Insurance Company

Application Re: Lien Granted

2/27/2021: Application Re: Lien Granted

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

4/27/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Standard Drywall, Inc.

7/7/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Standard Drywall, Inc.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial Filed

7/15/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Standard Drywall, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/09/2022 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/17/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 09/09/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Lien Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Lien Filed for Cypress Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Standard Drywall, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Build Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/07/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kenneth Kugel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANDARD DRYWALL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant

Latest cases where CARSON CONCRETE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, ROBERT M.