This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 09:49:13 (UTC).

Kraft VS Crane Co.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Kraft filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Crane Co. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7096

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

CRANE CO.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GRINNELL LLC

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

INGERSONLL-RAND COMPANY

3M COMPANY

CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY

COSCOL PETROLEUM CORPORATION

BROADSPECTRUM DOWNSTREAM SERVICES, INC

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC,

RILEY POWER INC.

27 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/29/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/1/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

6/28/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/11/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement

05/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

05/16/2022: Notice DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Notice DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

05/12/2022: Notice DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Request for Dismissal

03/03/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

03/18/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

03/18/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

03/18/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

03/11/2022: Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

406 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: John Kraft (Plaintiff); Kelly McIntosh-Kraft (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS Filed by: Albay Construction Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANYS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS Filed by: Republic Supply Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint filed by Kraft on 06/30/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by John Kraft and Kelly McIntosh-Kraft as to Boekel Industries, Inc.; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 03/18/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 03/18/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
287 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to 3M Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Westburne Supply, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for P.E. O'Hair & Co. as Predecessor to Westburne Supply Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Trimon, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 02/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Kraft; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less