Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 12:02:34 (UTC).

Kotula VS Meyer

Case Summary

On 02/16/2000 Kotula filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Meyer. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2945

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOTULA, TINA NOELLE

KOTULA, JON JAMES

Defendants

MEYER, ROELAND M.J.

BEDAIR, PENNY D.

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/16/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/24/2000 02:00 PM D- 702

3/20/2000: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/24/2000 02:00 PM D- 702

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/4/2000: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/4/2000: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Application Re: Postponement Filed for Roeland M.J. Meyer

4/6/2000: Application Re: Postponement Filed for Roeland M.J. Meyer

Application Re: Postponement Granted

4/10/2000: Application Re: Postponement Granted

Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 05/26/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

4/11/2000: Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 05/26/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

5/26/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

5/26/2000: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

6/2/2000: Rejection Letter Issued on Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

Letter from Plaintiff Tina Kotula - Receipt of Proof of Payment from Defendants, by Fax Filed

6/6/2000: Letter from Plaintiff Tina Kotula - Receipt of Proof of Payment from Defendants, by Fax Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/9/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

6/9/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Plaintiff Tina Kotula - Receipt of Proof of Payment from Defendants, by Fax Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2000
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 702 date: 06/09/2000 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 05/26/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Postponement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Postponement Filed for Roeland M.J. Meyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Roeland M.J. Meyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Penny D. Bedair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/24/2000 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/20/2000 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less