This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 04:20:59 (UTC).

Kinsman VS BWDAC

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Kinsman filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BWDAC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9368

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINSMAN, STANLEY Z

Defendants

BWDAC

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC

MORSE TEC LLC

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS INC

SUPREME PARTS UNLIMITED

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

THE MEAD CORPORATION,

THE PEP BOYS -

WESTROCK, MWV, LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

Other

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

TAVERA, LEONARD M.

GLEZAKOS, CHRISTINA M

LOVE, MARK A

OBERG, LISA L.

TURNER, GLEN

PRZETAK, LAURA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

8/31/2021: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

Case Management Conference 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

8/18/2021: Case Management Conference 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

9/30/2021: Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

Case Management Statement of Stanley Z Kinsman Filed

10/1/2021: Case Management Statement of Stanley Z Kinsman Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for BWDAC

9/21/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for BWDAC

Answer to Complaint Filed for Morse TEC LLC

9/21/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Morse TEC LLC

Answer to Complaint Filed for Honeywell International Inc.

9/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Honeywell International Inc.

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed

9/22/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/22/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for The Darcoid company of California

9/20/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for The Darcoid company of California

Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

8/31/2021: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

8/31/2021: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

8/31/2021: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stanley Z Kinsman

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stanley Z Kinsman

Complaint Asbestos Filed

8/16/2021: Complaint Asbestos Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

8/16/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Stanley Z Kinsman Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 01/14/2022 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Honeywell International Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for The Pep Boys -

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stanley Z Kinsman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MEAD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTROCK MWV, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant