This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 11:48:48 (UTC).

Kincaid VS Best

Case Summary

On 01/31/2000 Kincaid filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Best. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1060

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

KINCAID, WHITCOMB R.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

BEST, DAVE

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1/31/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/07/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

3/3/2000: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/07/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

3/14/2000: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

4/7/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

4/7/2000: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Declaration of Non-Military Service Filed

4/7/2000: Declaration of Non-Military Service Filed

Judgment Entered

4/7/2000: Judgment Entered

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

5/5/2000: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff found defective As to Dave Best

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Dave Best

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/07/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/03/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less