This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 06:21:32 (UTC).

Kim VS Tesla, Inc

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 Kim filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tesla, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3056

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM, CHONG WOO

Defendant

TESLA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BULLOCK, PATREA R

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/13/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

3/15/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

2/22/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed

9/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed

Case Management Statement of Chong Woo Kim Filed

9/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Chong Woo Kim Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/21/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/21/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to Tesla, Inc Filed

1/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to Tesla, Inc Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

2/3/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Conf Continuance 03/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

2/4/2020: Case Management Conf Continuance 03/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

10/31/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/1/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

11/1/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Pltf's Claims Against Def; Order Filed

11/1/2019: Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Pltf's Claims Against Def; Order Filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chong Woo Kim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tesla Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BULLOCK PATREA