This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/06/2022 at 15:17:50 (UTC).

Khan VS State of California

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Khan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jeffrey Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3713

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jeffrey Brand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashana S Khan

Defendants

CITY OF HAYWARD

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

ABM ONSITE SERVICES- WEST, INC

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Carolyn L. Katzorke

Harry Nalbandyan

Jeffrey R Vincent

Paul Caleo

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Declaration of Service by Mail

07/29/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

04/03/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

01/16/2020: Declaration of Service by Mail

Separate Statement

12/05/2019: Separate Statement

Proposed Order

12/05/2019: Proposed Order

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

12/04/2019: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Proposed Order

12/04/2019: Proposed Order

Declaration of Service by Mail

11/05/2019: Declaration of Service by Mail

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

05/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed

06/07/2021: Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed

Order Recusing Entire Alameda County Superior Court Bench Filed

08/10/2020: Order Recusing Entire Alameda County Superior Court Bench Filed

Response to Pltff's Informal Discovery Conference statement Filed

07/28/2020: Response to Pltff's Informal Discovery Conference statement Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

07/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed

07/24/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed

Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed

07/24/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Superior Court of California, County of Alameda Filed

07/20/2020: Case Management Statement of Superior Court of California, County of Alameda Filed

Case Management Statement of Superior Court of California, County of Alameda Filed

07/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Superior Court of California, County of Alameda Filed

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/07/2021

DocketMessage: Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021

DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2021

DocketMessage: Tentative Case Management Order; Category: Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketMessage: Hearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 302; Category: ScheduleHearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

DocketMessage: Order Recusing Entire Alameda County Superior Court Bench Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2020

DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2020

DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2020

DocketMessage: Response to Pltff's Informal Discovery Conference statement Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketMessage: Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketMessage: Informal Discovery Conference Statement Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
04/26/2019

DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Judicial Council of California Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019

DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019

DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Hayward Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019

DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019

DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Superior Court of California, County of Alameda Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2019

DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2019

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 08/20/2019 03:00 PM D- 22; Category: ScheduleHearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019

DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ashana S Khan; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019

DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less