This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/13/2021 at 04:08:22 (UTC).

Khadiri VS Mohammad

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Khadiri filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Mohammad. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET FUJIOKA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3728

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARGARET FUJIOKA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KHADIRI, MOHAMMAD BILAL

Respondent

MOHAMMAD, AFRA FATIMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SABHARWAL, SUNENA

BASHIR, ASMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing re Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order re:...; Judge: Margaret Fujioka; Department: Dept 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Stip and Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Mohammad Bilal Khadiri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order re:...; Judge: Margaret Fujioka; Department: Dept 510

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Afra Fatima Mohammad Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketRFO - Family Law 04/26/2021 01:00 PM D- 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Request for Order AS MODIFIED; Order Shortening Time; Temp Emerg Order AS MODIFIED Fi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Temporary Emergency Orders AS MODIFIED Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order re:... Child Custody,.. Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re Notice and Delivery of Request for Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bashir, Asma

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABHARWAL, SUNENA