This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 04:08:53 (UTC).

Karls VS Bland

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Karls filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1179

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARLS , WENDY

Defendants

EARLEY, DAVID

HOME REVIEW INSPECTIONS, LLC

BLAND , ERIC

RESNICK , KELLY

ERICKSON, PATRICK

GHAZANFAR - BLAND, FARZANA

INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ALFONZO, CHARLES A.

GLAUBIGER ESQ, ETHAN A.

LARSEN ESQ, DAVID J

ANTHONY, MANELKI

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

3/11/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

9/13/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

9/29/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/15/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Strike Complaint - Dropped

9/15/2021: Motion to Strike Complaint - Dropped

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/15/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer to Complaint - Dropped

9/15/2021: Demurrer to Complaint - Dropped

Objection to Request for Dismissal Filed

9/17/2021: Objection to Request for Dismissal Filed

Proposed Order Received

9/17/2021: Proposed Order Received

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

5/17/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

5/17/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Eric Bland Filed

5/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Eric Bland Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

5/17/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Home Review Inspections, LLC Filed

5/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Home Review Inspections, LLC Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Patrick Erickson Filed

5/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Patrick Erickson Filed

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection to Request for Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Demurrer to Complaint; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Strike Complaint; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Complaint - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Home Review Inspections, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Eric Bland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Wendy Karls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSEN ESQ, DAVID J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLAUBIGER ESQ, ETHAN A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALFONZO, CHARLES A.