This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 04:23:43 (UTC).

Kanine VS Rasier, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Kanine filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rasier, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2394

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANINE, ROSEANN

Defendants

PADILLA, JOSE A.

RASIER, LLC

RASIER-CA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

EISON, OWILI K

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 11/03/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

6/22/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/03/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/22/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/21/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roseann Kanine

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roseann Kanine

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

6/21/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/03/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roseann Kanine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eison, Owili K