This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 10:35:30 (UTC).

Joshi VS Sheikh

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Joshi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sheikh. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8822

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSHI, ASHVIN

JOSHI, PATRICIA

Defendants

SHEIKH, NOOR

SHEIKH, SAIQA ALI

SHEIKH, ATHER W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SUMNER, SCOTT H.Z.

FLYNN, LAURA S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/6/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

11/6/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/21/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ashvin Joshi

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ashvin Joshi

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

10/21/2020: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Noor Sheikh Filed

11/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Noor Sheikh Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ather W Sheikh Filed

11/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ather W Sheikh Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Saiqa Ali Sheikh Filed

11/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Saiqa Ali Sheikh Filed

Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

12/15/2020: Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Noor Sheikh, Saiqa Ali Sheikh, Ather W Sheikh

12/15/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Noor Sheikh, Saiqa Ali Sheikh, Ather W Sheikh

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Ashvin Joshi, Patricia Joshi Filed

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement of Ashvin Joshi, Patricia Joshi Filed

Case Management Statement of Noor Sheikh, Saiqa Ali Sheikh, Ather W Sheikh Filed

2/22/2021: Case Management Statement of Noor Sheikh, Saiqa Ali Sheikh, Ather W Sheikh Filed

Case Management Statement of Ashvin Joshi, Patricia Joshi Filed

2/18/2021: Case Management Statement of Ashvin Joshi, Patricia Joshi Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

7/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/25/2022 02:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/14/2022 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 03/04/2022 09:00 AM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Noor Sheikh, Saiqa Ali Sheikh, Ather W Sheikh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Noor Sheikh Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Ather W Sheikh Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Saiqa Ali Sheikh Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ashvin Joshi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLYNN, LAURA S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUMNER SCOTT H.Z.