This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 23:04:25 (UTC).

Jones VS Tatro

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tatro. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2074

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, MONIQUE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HOWARD, MARK

TATRO, NATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORGAN, THOMAS A.

O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

LANDESS, ELIZABETH GONG

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Change of Address Filed

2/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

6/29/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Nathan Tatro

8/28/2020: Cross-Complaint Filed for Nathan Tatro

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

8/28/2020: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

8/28/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Nathan Tatro

8/28/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Nathan Tatro

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Nathan Tatro

8/28/2020: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Nathan Tatro

Case Management Statement of Nathan Tatro Filed

8/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Nathan Tatro Filed

Case Management Statement of Mark Howard Filed

8/31/2020: Case Management Statement of Mark Howard Filed

Case Management Statement of Monique Jones Filed

9/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Monique Jones Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Mark Howard

9/18/2020: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Mark Howard

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed

10/26/2020: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

10/26/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit Filed

6/2/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit Filed

Case Management Statement of Monique Jones Filed

5/13/2020: Case Management Statement of Monique Jones Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Mark Howard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/11/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 09/03/2021 01:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Monique Jones Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Mark Howard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mark Howard Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Mark Howard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Monique Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN, THOMAS A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDESS, ELIZABETH G.